HI SB2057 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for a grant-in-aid to the County of Hawaii to hire an engineering firm to study, plan, assist, and conduct preliminary design and concept work for a two-phase project to restore the Kahaluu Beach Park in the County of Hawaii. Conditions the appropriations on the County of Hawaii's contribution of matching funds. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Beach Park Restoration.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2613) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-14-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2143 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Beach Restoration
County of Hawaii
Expenditure Ceiling
Grant-in-Aid
Kahaluu Beach Park
Beach Restoration
County of Hawaii
Expenditure Ceiling
Grant-in-Aid
Kahaluu Beach Park