HI SB2053 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act 058, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act 058, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the regulation of athletic trainers. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Athletic Trainers.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Act 058, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2018-06-29 | House | Act 058, on 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 50-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 50-18). |
2018-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Cullen, Ito, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ito, Ward. |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 448). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1858-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1325-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1185-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, LoPresti, Onishi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tokioka, Woodson. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-02 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 30) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-01-18. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2528) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2062 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).