HI SB2050 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a regulatory framework for products containing CBD that were manufactured legally through approved government programs. Clarifies that these products are not considered adulterated food, beverage, or cosmetic products. Prohibits manufacturers from making health related claims. Requires product labeling for the products to be legally allowed in the State. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Industrial Hemp Derived Products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-20 10:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC.
2020-02-13SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2656) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/JDC.
2020-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Fevella.
2020-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:20PM in conference room 224.
2020-01-17SenateReferred to AEN, CPH/JDC.
2020-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback