HI SB2049 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the information required to be in a time share disclosure statement, under certain circumstances. Amends the information required to be on a developer registration renewal application. Expands the information developers are not required to include on a developer registration renewal application. Limits the copies of documents developers are required to submit in a developer registration renewal application. Requires developers to submit copies of supplementary plan documents of the time share plan. Allows for submission of certain document in electronic form. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Time Sharing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 96) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2960) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2223 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Annual Renewal Registration
Developer Applications
Disclosure Statements
Encumbrances
Time Share
Time Sharing
Developer Applications
Disclosure Statements
Encumbrances
Time Share
Time Sharing