HI SB2043 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation, Hawaii community development authority, and Hawaii public housing authority to sell leasehold units in residential condominiums located on state lands. Takes effect 6/18/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Leasehold Condominiums On State Land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 94) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere, L. Thielen. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3180) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2346) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Leasehold Condominiums on State Land
Leases
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Leasehold Condominiums on State Land
Leases