HI SB2042 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hawaii public housing authority to establish a rent-to-own pilot program subject to any applicable federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-01-17SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-16SenateReferred to HOU, WAM.
2020-01-15SenateIntroduced and passed First Reading.
2020-01-14SenatePending Introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback