HI SB2040 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that under the Hawaii Post-Secondary Education Authorization Program, when an institution ceases to operate, the student transcripts shall be kept permanently in a form prescribed by the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs, and other records requested and obtained by the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs may be disposed of at the Director's discretion. (SB2040 HD1)
Title
Post-Secondary Education; Authorization; Closed Institution Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ing, Ohno, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Kong, Takumi, Tupola. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 40) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2520) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2328) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HEA, CPH. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1894 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Act 143, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).