HI SB2038 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that each neighbor island county is represented on the early learning board without term limits, subject to removal and replacement by the mayor of the respective counties.
Title
Relating To Early Learning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 229 + videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2038&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2038_.HTM |