HI SB2038 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 2:45PM in conference room 225.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Hearing: Jan 28 @ 2:45 pm in Conference Room 225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits two or more members of a board to attend state of the city, state of the county, state of the State, or state of the judiciary addresses; provided that the board members do not discuss board business and no commitment to vote is made or sought.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Board Members.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-16SenateReferred to GVO, JDC.
2020-01-15SenateIntroduced and passed First Reading.
2020-01-14SenatePending Introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback