HI SB2035 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that in evaluating and determining the award for redevelopment of state or county level through competitive sealed bidding or competitive sealed proposals, the number of housing units proposed shall constitute forty per cent of the evaluation score regardless of whether the development of housing is proposed. Applies to the urban areas of state or county land located within a one-half mile radius of a mass transit station. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from GVO/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2588) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HOU, JDC. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Competitive Sealed Bidding
Competitive Sealed Proposals
Evaluation
Housing
Procurement Code
State and County Redevelopment
Competitive Sealed Proposals
Evaluation
Housing
Procurement Code
State and County Redevelopment