HI SB2034 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires assessment of patients who are subject to emergency hospitalization, diagnosed with a mental illness or severe substance use disorder, and found to be lacking decisional capacity to determine if a surrogate or guardian needs to be appointed to make appropriate health care decisions for the patient. Authorizes certain health care providers to make determinations on the presence of mental illness, substance abuse disorder, and decisional capacity of the patient. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 03-18-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 111) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3157) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2308) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |