HI SB2032 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination, including in advertisements for available real property, based on participation in a housing assistance program, or requirements related to participation in housing assistance programs, in real estate transactions and requirements. Takes effect on 6/18/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Rental Discrimination.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 89) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3260) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2349) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |