HI SB2031 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary health care case management task force in the department of human services to research the quality of care provided by case managers and case management agencies and to ensure that appropriate standards of practice are consistently followed. (SD1)
Title
Certified Case Managers; Certification Required
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2069) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Espero. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-03-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-02-10 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to HTH/HMS, CPN. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |