HI SB2028 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Department of Housing. Places the Hawaii Community Development Authority, Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation, Office of Planning and Sustainable Development, and Hawaii Public Housing Authority under the Department of Housing for administrative purposes. Replaces the Director of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism with the Director of Housing on the Hawaii Community Development Authority. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2309) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 1:30PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HOU/GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |