HI SB2027 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 219, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 219, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services for the Coordinated Statewide Homeless Initiative. Requires the Department to procure the services of a master contractor to manage subcontracts and expenditures for services provided through the initiative. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Appropriations To Address Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 219, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1328). |
2018-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 219, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1328). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka voting no (2) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 155-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 155-18). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 686). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Luke, Gates, Nakamura, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 689). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Espero, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325. |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Brower, Luke Co-Chairs; Gates, Nakamura, Tupola. |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 10:35AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 10:35AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 828). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Espero, English Co-Chairs; S. Chang, K. Kahele. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Brower, Luke Co-Chairs; Gates, Nakamura, Tupola. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 497). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1889-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HHS/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1449-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, McDermott. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:55AM in conference room 423. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on HHS/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-18 at 10:55 am. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS/HSG on Friday, 03-16-18 9:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 72) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2856) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2021) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-18 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |