HI SB2026 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enters Hawaii into the Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact to allow EMS personnel from other states to practice in Hawaii during a declared emergency.
Title
Relating To The Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:30PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/HTH, CPN/JDC. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HTH/LCA, CPN/JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2026&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2026_.HTM |