HI SB2025 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to JUD/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to JUD/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits minors to consent to medical care related to the diagnosis or treatment of HIV or the prevention of HIV. Takes effect 8/1/2026. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Medical Care For Minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 88) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2991) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-20 10:45AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2659) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |