HI SB202 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB202
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends statutory provisions relating to quorum and voting requirements for service area boards on mental health and substance abuse. Designates service area boards on mental health and substance abuse within the department of health for administrative purposes.
Title
Relating To Service Area Boards.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 26). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB202 (Carry Over) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=202&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB202_.HTM |