HI SB2018 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a $50,000,000 revolving line of credit sub-fund under the umbrella of the green energy market securitization loan fund for any state agency or department to finance energy efficiency measures.
Title
Relating To Energy Efficiency.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2029 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Energy Efficiency
Green Energy Market Securitization Loan Fund
Green Infrastructure Loan Program
Sub-Fund ($)
Green Energy Market Securitization Loan Fund
Green Infrastructure Loan Program
Sub-Fund ($)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2018&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2018_.HTM |