HI SB2017 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - (S) Act 006, 3/16/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 362).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - (S) Act 006, 3/16/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 362).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a claims adjuster to take an examination approved by the Risk Management Agency of the United States Department of Agriculture in order to qualify for a limited insurance adjuster's license.
Title
Insurance Claims Adjusters; Crop Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | (S) Act 006, 3/16/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 362). | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Act 006, on 3/16/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 209). | |
2010-03-05 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 256). | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Har, Pine, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Hanohano, Marumoto, Nakashima, M. Oshiro, Thielen, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-24 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Ito, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Karamatsu, Luke, Morita. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-24-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27 | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 16). | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Tokuda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) One Day Notice 02-10-10. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2117) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Green, Sakamoto, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Ihara. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-10 9:00 AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |