HI SB2014 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes additional uses for moneys in the reduced ignition propensity cigarette program special fund to support the State Fire Council and its programs and activities. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To The Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1481 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Fire Protection
Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program Special Fund
State Fire Council Package
Fire Protection
Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program Special Fund
State Fire Council Package
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2014&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2014_.HTM |