HI SB2012 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the State Fire Council additional flexibility in employing personnel to administer the reduced ignition propensity cigarette program.
Title
Relating To The Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1479 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Fire Protection
Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program
Special Fund
Staff
State Fire Council Package
Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program
Special Fund
Staff
State Fire Council Package
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2012&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2012_.HTM |