HI SB2011 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HSG/WAL/JHA, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HSG/WAL/JHA, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the construction of multi-family dwelling units on any lot within certain designated county zoning districts, subject to reasonable standards adopted by each county. Takes effect 4/14/2112. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL/JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 57) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2996) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 10:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from HOU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2162) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/WTL, JDC. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU/WTL, JDC. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |