HI SB2009 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for direct health care services for the uninsured and underinsured, basic adult dental benefits for Medicaid enrollees, outreach and eligibility services at Federally Qualified Health Centers, health care homes, and behavioral health services at Federally Qualified Community Health Centers. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2009 HD1)
Title
Community Health Centers; Appropriations; Federally Qualified Health Centers ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Carroll, Jordan Co-Chairs; Onishi, Oshiro, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Green, Kidani Co-Chairs. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 523). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1549-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamashita, Ward. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1176-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-18 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-18-14 9:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 81) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2756) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making meeting on 02-26-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2368) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-14 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1751 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3