HI SB2006 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes ranked choice voting for special federal elections and special elections of vacant county council seats. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Ranked Choice Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-03-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-03-12HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 03-16-20 at 2:00 PM.
2020-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:31PM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 85) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kim. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3073) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, K. Kahele.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2020-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-12SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2560) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 10:01AM in conference room 016.
2020-01-15SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2020-01-15SenateIntroduced and passed First Reading.
2020-01-09SenatePending Introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2121 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback