HI SB2005 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to GVO/EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to GVO/EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes limits on the government's use of facial recognition systems, with certain specified exceptions.
Title
Relating To Violation Of Privacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EET, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1869 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2005&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2005_.HTM |