HI SB2003 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires police commissions to establish and police officers to complete training programs on cultural competency and implicit bias and racial and ethnic sensitivity. Requires the Department of Law Enforcement to establish and law enforcement officers to complete training programs on cultural competency and implicit bias and racial and ethnic sensitivity. Requires police commissions to ensure that all full-time police officers receive crisis intervention training related to interaction with persons with mental disabilities. Requires police commissions to establish policies for officer interaction with persons with mental disabilities and homeless persons.
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-24-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Bias and Cultural Competency
Crisis Intervention
Law Enforcement Officers
Persons with Mental Disabilities
Police Commissions
Police Officers
Training
Crisis Intervention
Law Enforcement Officers
Persons with Mental Disabilities
Police Commissions
Police Officers
Training
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2003&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2003_.HTM |