HI SB2003 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the department of land and natural resources from issuing new aquarium fish permits to take aquatic life for commercial or non-commercial aquarium purposes, except for a period of four months. Phases out the taking of aquatic life for commercial aquarium purposes by any method of catch, though allowing aquarium fish permits to be annually renewed by individuals possessing a commercial marine license and, for a period of five years, transferrable to another individual who possesses a commercial marine license. Continues to allow the taking of aquatic life for non-commercial aquarium purposes using certain nets or traps with an aquarium fish permit, and clarifies that non-commercial aquarium collecting by any method of catch is subject to a limit of five fish or aquatic life specimens per person, per day. Allows a commercial marine licensee to assist another commercial marine licensee who holds a valid, non-lapsed aquarium permit with the taking of aquatic life for commercial aquarium purposes. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Aquatic Life.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2385) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, L. Thielen. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-07-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-02-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |