HI SB2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB2
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that lands set aside by the governor to the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation or leased to the corporation by other state departments or agencies are exempt from the definition of "public lands". Clarifies that lands set aside by the governor or leased to the Hawaii housing finance development corporation from other state departments or agencies are subject to legislative approval prior to the sale or gift of those lands. Requires the corporation to return any land leased to the corporation by other state departments or agencies if the land is no longer needed for housing, finance, or development. Requires the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation to give preference to individuals on the department of Hawaiian home lands waiting list regarding government or crown lands set aside or leased to the corporation prior to the corporation developing or financing an affordable housing development on those lands. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused. |
2021-04-09 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1877) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Sayama, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Branco, Eli, Holt, Marten, Perruso, Tam, Wildberger; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-07-21. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Branco, Gates, Holt, LoPresti, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Sayama, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Eli, Ganaden, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Ward voting no (10) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1504), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; 4 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Tokioka, Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Branco, Gates, Holt, LoPresti, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Sayama, Tokioka, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Eli, Ganaden, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto, Perruso, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1014) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Branco, Kong; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ganaden; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) DeCoite; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Tuesday, 03-16-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 & 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 136) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Keohokalole, Kim, Riviere. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 807) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 137) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HOU, WAM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2 (Carry Over) 2021-04-13 - Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused.
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Public Lands
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Public Lands