HI SB198 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB198
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the maximum age of minors for which safe storage of firearms is required from sixteen to eighteen years.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB198 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Re-Referred to JDC.
HB31 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 148, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
HB31 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 148, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=198&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB198_.HTM |