HI SB195 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB195

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends section 11-342, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to increase transparency by requiring candidate committees and noncandidate committees to file fundraiser notices regardless of the price or suggested contribution for attending the function.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Committee Fundraisers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-23SenateReferred to JDC.
2023-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB195 (Carry Over) 2023-01-23 - Referred to JDC.
HB90 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Act 004, 03/31/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback