HI SB192 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB192

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the Department of Human Services to administer and provide public assistance to eligible residents of the State during a governor-declared state of emergency. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1443), recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-23HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
2021-03-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from PDP/HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-18HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-03-18HouseThe committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
2021-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PDP/HHH on Thursday, 03-18-21 11:30AM in House conference room 309 & 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to PDP/HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 167) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 862) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-03-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2021-02-18SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 388) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB479 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB192 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback