HI SB19 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reauthorizes the counties' authority to establish a county surcharge on state tax for a limited time period, with the surcharge to be effective from 1/1/2017 to 12/31/2027, if adopted. Allows counties that have already established a county surcharge on state tax to extend the surcharge on state tax to 12/31/2027. Requires the board of directors of the transit agency constructing the locally preferred alternative for a mass transit project to conduct audits, submit annual reports to the governor and the legislature, and conduct public hearings and take testimony on the audits and reports. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Public Transit; County Surcharge on State Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 50) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Wakai . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) L. Thielen, Riviere, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 898) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM, with Senators Riviere, Thielen and Slom voting "No". |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from TRA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 345) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TRA/PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |