HI SB188 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the definition of large cigar and adds a new definition of premium cigar. Changes the tax rate on sales of premium cigars. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Cigars; Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/EDB on Wednesday, 03-20-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 86) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Solomon . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 553) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-14-13 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-04-13 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |