HI SB188 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts any new construction or expansion of existing fossil-fueled, electricity-generating facilities unless the electric utility company can demonstrate compliance with the State's renewable energy portfolio standards; exempts any retrofit or replacement for the purposes of improved efficiency or to lower greenhouse gas emissions; provides exemption if an emergency is declared. (SD1)
Title
Fossil-Fueled, Electricity-Generating Facility; Restriction
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-11 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |