HI SB175 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB175

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts certain applications from the automatic refusal provision that may be invoked by a majority of nearby voters or real estate owners; specifically, applications for a class 1 or class 18 license on land designated as agricultural by state or county zoning laws and for which the majority of the agricultural commodities used in the manufacturing of the liquor are grown and produced in the State by the license holder. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-18SenateReported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 328) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 1:50PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to PSM/AEN, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB122 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB175 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback