HI SB171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a county education task force to establish a process for the transfer of jurisdiction over all public schools, including all state public education functions and funding, from the State to the county in which the public school is located. Requires report to legislature prior to the convening of the Regular Session of 2021. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseThe committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 61) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EDU/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Kanuha ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee on PSM deferred the measure.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to EDU/PSM, WAM.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB189 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 2

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback