HI SB168 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows counties to set their own minimum wage at a rate that is higher than the state minimum wage rate. Increases the minimum wage in the State to $15 per hour beginning 1/1/2020. Authorizes the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to annually adjust the minimum hourly wage rate in accordance with the Honolulu Region Consumer Price Index beginning on 1/1/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Minimum Wage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateReferred to LCA/PSM, WAM.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB186 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback