HI SB161 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates grant funding to the YMCA of Honolulu for its Youth Wellness Program for Mental Health to address the statewide declining mental health outcomes of youths related to the coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 305) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1342 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB161 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB161 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Grant-in-Aid
Mental Health and Wellness
YMCA of Honolulu
Youth Wellness Program for Mental Health
Youths ($)
Mental Health and Wellness
YMCA of Honolulu
Youth Wellness Program for Mental Health
Youths ($)