HI SB157 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB157

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the exemption granted to churches by Act 22, Session Laws of Hawaii 2020, relating to bonding requirements and fee requirements for licenses, renewals, and reinstatements of licenses applicable to cemeteries and funeral trusts. Clarifies that the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs shall exempt any cemetery authority from the bonding requirement and the fee requirements for license, renewal, and reinstatement upon proof satisfactory to the Director that the cemetery authority does not sell for financial profit. Effective retroactively to 09/15/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cemeteries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-31SenateThe committee on CPN deferred the measure.
2023-01-27SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 9:05AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
2023-01-23SenateReferred to CPN.
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced and passed First Reading.
2023-01-17SenatePending Introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB157 (Carry Over) 2023-01-31 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
HB646 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback