HI SB1568 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1568
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period in which a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions, from 3/31/2019 to 12/31/2023. Authorizes the use of county surcharge revenues for housing infrastructure. Temporarily authorizes counties that have previously adopted a surcharge on state tax to amend the rates and uses of the surcharge. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to LGO, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 489) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HOU/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 462) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |