HI SB156 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all new development projects with over 50 units to install solar water heater systems and requires the counties to establish rules for the installation of solar water heater systems.
Title
Energy Conservation; Solar Water Heater Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-12-09 2:45 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-10-09 2:45 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Referred to ENE, EDH/TIA. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=156&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB156_.HTM |