HI SB1559 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1559

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Constitution to allow electronic copies, as an alternative to printed copies, of a bill to be made available for members of a house of the Legislature in which the bill is being voted upon for third or final reading in fulfillment of the 48-hour availability requirement. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing An Amendment To Article Iii, Section 15, Of The Hawaii State Constitution To Allow Electronic Copies, As An Alternative To Printed Copies, Of A Bill To Be Made Available For Members Of A House In Which The Bill Is Being Voted Upon For Third Or Final Reading In Fulfillment Of The Forty-eight Hour Availability Requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2023-02-16SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 374) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2023-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-09-23 9:25AM; Conference Room 016.
2023-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
2023-01-30SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2023-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1559 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback