HI SB1549 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1549
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for operating costs and personnel to manage certain trailheads as part of the Na Ala Hele Trail and Access Program. Takes effect 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 12:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1394 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
SB1549 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1549 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Na Ala Hele Program
Operating Costs
Positions
Trails
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Na Ala Hele Program
Operating Costs
Positions
Trails