HI SB1547 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1547

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a food and product innovation network within the Agribusiness Development Corporation. Appropriates moneys for food and product innovation facilities on the islands of Molokai and Oahu. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Value-added Products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
2023-03-17HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD.
2023-03-15HouseThe committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
2023-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-15-23 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-09HouseReferred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 485) in amended form (SD 1).
2023-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2023-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2023-02-17SenateReported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 552) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2023-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
2023-01-30SenateReferred to AEN/EET, WAM.
2023-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1547 (Carry Over) 2023-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
HB1426 (Same As) 2023-04-11 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 666).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback