HI SB1542 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1542
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for the Board of Water Supply to offset the design and construction costs for one of four exploratory wells proposed by the Board of Water Supply for the proposed Kunia wells IV pump station to meet future potable water requirements for growth, including diversified agriculture. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To An Appropriation For A Kunia Wells Iv Exploratory Well.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 520) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1167) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 460) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1542 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB594 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB594 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
City and County of Honolulu Board of Water Supply
DLNR
Exploratory Well
Kunia Wells IV Pump Station
City and County of Honolulu Board of Water Supply
DLNR
Exploratory Well
Kunia Wells IV Pump Station