HI SB1538 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires bail to be set in reasonable amounts based upon all available information, including the alleged offense, possible punishment upon conviction, and the offender's financial ability to afford bail. Repeals the requirement of an officer letting to bail to consider the punishment to be inflicted on conviction and the pecuniary circumstances of the party accused. Allows pretrial service officers to access other state agencies' data on an offender's wages and tax information for the limited purpose of determining an appropriate bail amount. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Bail.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback