HI SB1537 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1537
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of public safety to contract with the social science research institute of the University of Hawaii at Manoa for evidence-based research and to collect data on behalf of the department of public safety. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Public Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 594) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HRE, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1537 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Data Collection
Department of Public Safety
Social Science Research Institute
University of Hawaii
Data Collection
Department of Public Safety
Social Science Research Institute
University of Hawaii