HI SB1533 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 226, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 226, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a person commits the offense of cruelty to animals in the second degree if the person kills without need any animal other than insects, vermin, or other pests; provided they are handled in accordance with standard and acceptable pest control practices and all applicable laws and regulations. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB1533 HD1)
Title
Cruelty to Animals; Exception for Insects, Vermin, and Other Pests
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 226, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 226, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 698). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Deferred until 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) One Day Notice 04-29-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-29-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-06-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Ito, Luke, Souki, Thielen. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 398). | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Deferred until 04-06-11. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 372). | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused (5). | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-24-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-24-11. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-17-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 368) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |