HI SB1529 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Hawaii state energy office. Establishes the deputy director of energy. Ends funding for the Hawaii clean energy initiative from the energy security special fund. Increases the distribution of tax revenue to the energy systems development special fund. Appropriates funds from the general fund for the Hawaii state energy office. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Energy And Climate Change Office.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 516) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1149) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from AEN/EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 662) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to AEN/EET/WTL, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback